US HB159 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 19-9-1)
Status: Engrossed on January 28 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-04 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 28 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-04 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Stop Exploitation Through Trafficking Act of 2015 (Sec. 2) Amends the Omnibus Crime Control and Safe Streets Act of 1968 to authorize the Attorney General to give preferential consideration in awarding Community Oriented Police Services grants to an application from an applicant in a state that has in effect a law that: (1) treats a minor who has engaged in, or has attempted to engage in, a commercial sex act as a victim of a severe form of trafficking in persons; (2) discourages the charging or prosecution of such individual for a prostitution or sex trafficking offense based on such conduct; and (3) encourages the diversion of such an individual to appropriate service providers, including child welfare services, victim treatment programs, child advocacy centers, rape crisis centers, or other social services. (Sec. 3) Amends the Victims of Trafficking and Violence Protection Act of 2000 (VTVPA) to require the Attorney General's annual report on federal agencies that are implementing provisions relating to the Interagency Task Force to Monitor and Combat Trafficking to include information on the activities of such agencies in cooperation with state, tribal, and local law enforcement officials to identify, investigate, and prosecute: (1) sex trafficking by force, fraud, or coercion or with a minor; (2) sexual exploitation of children; (3) the selling and buying of children; (4) transportation with intent that the victim engage in illegal sexual activity; (5) coercion or enticement to travel for illegal sexual activity; and (6) transportation of minors for illegal sexual activity. (Sec. 4) Amends the VTVPA to require the Secretary of Health and Human Services, annually beginning in FY2017, to make grants for a national communication system to assist victims of severe forms of trafficking in persons in communicating with service providers. (Sec. 5) Amends the Workforce Innovation and Opportunity Act to include victims of a severe form of trafficking in persons among those eligible for the Job Corps without being required to demonstrate low-income eligibility. (Sec. 6) Amends the federal judicial code to authorize the United States Marshals Service to assist state, local, and other federal law enforcement agencies, upon request, in locating and recovering missing children.
Title
Stop Exploitation Through Trafficking Act of 2015
Sponsors
Rep. Erik Paulsen [R-MN] | Rep. Gwen Moore [D-WI] | Rep. John Kline [R-MN] | Rep. Bruce Westerman [R-AR] |
Rep. Rodney Frelinghuysen [R-NJ] | Rep. Keith Ellison [D-MN] | Rep. Ann Wagner [R-MO] | Rep. Randy Weber [R-TX] |
Sen. Kevin Cramer [R-ND] | Rep. Juan Vargas [D-CA] | Rep. Theodore Deutch [D-FL] | Rep. Jackie Speier [D-CA] |
Rep. Alan Lowenthal [D-CA] | Rep. Matthew Cartwright [D-PA] | Rep. Robert Latta [R-OH] | Rep. Ted Poe [R-TX] |
Rep. Jaime Herrera Beutler [R-WA] | Rep. Blake Farenthold [R-TX] | Rep. Diane Black [R-TN] | Rep. Lynn Jenkins [R-KS] |
Rep. Tim Walberg [R-MI] | Rep. Vicky Hartzler [R-MO] | Rep. Rodney Davis [R-IL] | Rep. Mike Bishop [R-MI] |
Rep. Robert Pittenger [R-NC] | Rep. Kristi Noem [R-SD] | Rep. Derek Kilmer [D-WA] | Rep. Karen Bass [D-CA] |
Sen. Kyrsten Sinema [I-AZ] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-04 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. |
2015-01-28 | Senate | Received in the Senate. |
2015-01-27 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2015-01-27 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H592-593) |
2015-01-27 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 159. |
2015-01-27 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H592-595) |
2015-01-27 | House | Mr. Sensenbrenner moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2015-01-27 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 2. |
2015-01-27 | House | Committee on Education and the Workforce discharged. |
2015-01-27 | House | Reported by the Committee on Judiciary. H. Rept. 114-6, Part I. |
2015-01-21 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote. |
2015-01-21 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2015-01-20 | House | Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations Discharged. |
2015-01-07 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations. |
2015-01-06 | House | Referred to House Education and the Workforce |
2015-01-06 | House | Referred to House Judiciary |
2015-01-06 | House | Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committee on Education and the Workforce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2015-01-06 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB166 (Related) 2015-03-02 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 25.
Subjects
Child safety and welfare
Crime and law enforcement
Crime victims
Crimes against children
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Criminal justice information and records
Employment and training programs
Government information and archives
Human trafficking
Intergovernmental relations
Law enforcement administration and funding
Sex offenses
State and local government operations
Telephone and wireless communication
Youth employment and child labor
Crime and law enforcement
Crime victims
Crimes against children
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Criminal justice information and records
Employment and training programs
Government information and archives
Human trafficking
Intergovernmental relations
Law enforcement administration and funding
Sex offenses
State and local government operations
Telephone and wireless communication
Youth employment and child labor