US HB1565 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 185-3-1)
Status: Introduced on April 15 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-04-30 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, And Investigations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 15 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-04-30 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, And Investigations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Public Safety and Second Amendment Rights Protection Act of 2013 - Amends the Brady Handgun Violence Prevention Act to reauthorize for FY2014-FY2017 the grant program for improvements to the criminal history record system. Amends the NICS Improvement Amendments Act of 2007 to: (1) establish a four-year implementation plan to ensure maximum coordination and automation of reporting of records or making records available to the National Instant Criminal Background Check System; (2) direct the Attorney General to make grants to states, Indian tribal governments, and state court systems to improve the automation and transmittal of mental health records and criminal history dispositions; (3) provide for reductions in grant funding to states that have not implemented a relief from disabilities program; (4) make federal court information available for inclusion in the System; and (5) allow the submission to the System of mental health records that would otherwise be protected by the Health Insurance Portability and Accountability Act (HIPAA). Provides that nothing in this Act shall be construed to: (1) expand the enforcement authority or jurisdiction of the Bureau of Alcohol, Tobacco, Firearms, and Explosives (ATF); (2) allow the establishment, directly or indirectly, of a federal firearms registry; or (3) extend background check requirements to transfers of firearms other than those made at gun shows or over the Internet, or to temporary transfers for purposes including lawful hunting or sporting, or to temporary possession of a firearm for purposes of examination or evaluation by a prospective transferee. National Commission on Mass Violence Act of 2013 - Establishes the National Commission on Mass Violence to study the availability and nature of firearms, including the means of acquiring firearms, issues relating to mental health, and the impacts of the availability and nature of firearms on incidents of mass violence or in preventing mass violence. Requires the Commission to conduct a comprehensive factual study of incidents of mass violence, including incidents not involving firearms, to determine the root causes of such mass violence.
Title
Public Safety and Second Amendment Rights Protection Act of 2013
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-30 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations. |
2013-04-26 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Disability Assistance and Memorial Affairs. |
2013-04-15 | House | Referred to House Veterans' Affairs |
2013-04-15 | House | Referred to House Judiciary |
2013-04-15 | House | Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1605 (Related) 2013-04-30 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations.
HB3335 (Related) 2014-01-09 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations.
HB3335 (Related) 2014-01-09 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations.
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Administrative remedies
Advisory bodies
Census and government statistics
Child health
Child safety and welfare
Civil actions and liability
Crime and law enforcement
Crime prevention
Criminal justice information and records
Department of Justice
Department of Veterans Affairs
Domestic violence and child abuse
Firearms and explosives
Government information and archives
Government studies and investigations
Health information and medical records
Intergovernmental relations
Internet and video services
Judicial review and appeals
Law enforcement administration and funding
Licensing and registrations
Mental health
Military personnel and dependents
Museums, exhibitions, cultural centers
Retail and wholesale trades
School administration
State and local government operations
Teaching, teachers, curricula
User charges and fees
Veterans' medical care
Violent crime
Administrative remedies
Advisory bodies
Census and government statistics
Child health
Child safety and welfare
Civil actions and liability
Crime and law enforcement
Crime prevention
Criminal justice information and records
Department of Justice
Department of Veterans Affairs
Domestic violence and child abuse
Firearms and explosives
Government information and archives
Government studies and investigations
Health information and medical records
Intergovernmental relations
Internet and video services
Judicial review and appeals
Law enforcement administration and funding
Licensing and registrations
Mental health
Military personnel and dependents
Museums, exhibitions, cultural centers
Retail and wholesale trades
School administration
State and local government operations
Teaching, teachers, curricula
User charges and fees
Veterans' medical care
Violent crime
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/113th-congress/house-bill/1565/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/113/bills/hr1565/BILLS-113hr1565ih.pdf |