US HB1554 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 15 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-17 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 15 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-17 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Jessie's Law This bill requires the Department of Health and Human Services to develop and disseminate standards for hospitals and physicians regarding displaying the history of opioid addiction in the medical records of patients who have provided information about their addiction to a health care provider.
Title
Jessie's Law
Sponsors
Rep. Tim Walberg [R-MI] | Rep. Debbie Dingell [D-MI] | Rep. Alexander Mooney [R-WV] | Rep. Evan Jenkins [R-WV] |
Rep. Eric Swalwell [D-CA] | Rep. Brian Fitzpatrick [R-PA] | Rep. Thomas MacArthur [R-NJ] | Rep. Donald Norcross [D-NJ] |
Rep. Patrick Meehan [R-PA] | Rep. Ann Kuster [D-NH] | Rep. Ro Khanna [D-CA] | Rep. Mark DeSaulnier [D-CA] |
Rep. Vicky Hartzler [R-MO] | Rep. Luke Messer [R-IN] | Rep. Carol Shea-Porter [D-NH] | Rep. Bruce Poliquin [R-ME] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-17 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2017-03-15 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
2017-03-15 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB581 (Same As) 2017-08-11 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
HB5009 (Related) 2018-06-13 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
HB5009 (Related) 2018-06-13 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
Subjects
Drug therapy
Drug trafficking and controlled substances
Drug, alcohol, tobacco use
Health
Health information and medical records
Health personnel
Drug trafficking and controlled substances
Drug, alcohol, tobacco use
Health
Health information and medical records
Health personnel
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/house-bill/1554/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/hr1554/BILLS-115hr1554ih.pdf |