US HB1504 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 24-0)
Status: Introduced on March 19 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-11-16 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Early Childhood, Elementary, and Secondary Education.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Early Childhood, Elementary, and Secondary Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 19 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-11-16 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Early Childhood, Elementary, and Secondary Education.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Early Childhood, Elementary, and Secondary Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Reducing Federal Mandates on School Lunch Act This bill prohibits the Department of Agriculture (USDA) from implementing, administering, or enforcing a specified regulation, or promulgating or enforcing any new rule or regulation, establishing a maximum calorie limit or quantity of grains, meat, or meat alternatives for the school lunch program. USDA may not implement, administer, or enforce specified rules and regulations with respect to any school food authority that certifies to its state that it: (1) has calculated the costs of complying with such rules and regulations; and (2) has determined, in a manner consistent with school district operational procedures, that it cannot operate a food service program without incurring increased costs for complying with those rules and regulations. Those rules and regulations are: the rule entitled "National School Lunch Program and School Breakfast Program: Nutrition Standards for All Foods Sold in School as Required by the Healthy, Hunger-Free Kids Act of 2010"; any new rule regarding foods sold in schools that are not foods provided under the school lunch or breakfast programs; a specified regulation and any new rule or regulation regarding school lunch price increases; and a specified regulation and any new rule or regulation which establishes new food-based meal patterns, nutrition standards, or meal planning approaches for the school breakfast program. USDA may not define the phrase "costs of complying" or establish or suggest how a school food authority is to calculate those costs or increased costs for complying. The prohibitions will remain in effect until a law is enacted that extends by at least five fiscal years the authorization or duration of one or more school lunch or breakfast programs. The bill amends the Richard B. Russell National School Lunch Act to prohibit USDA from implementing any regulation that would require a reduction in the quantity of sodium contained in federally reimbursed meals, foods, and snacks sold in schools below specified July 2014 maximum levels allowed in school breakfasts for school year 2014-2015. With respect to grain contents, USDA shall only require that half of all grains in such food items are whole grain-rich. School food authorities must comply with the applicable grain component or standard with respect to the school lunch or school breakfast program in effect before July 1, 2014.
Title
Reducing Federal Mandates on School Lunch Act
Sponsors
Rep. Kristi Noem [R-SD] | Rep. Rodney Davis [R-IL] | Rep. Glenn Thompson [R-PA] | Rep. Dan Benishek [R-MI] |
Rep. Steve Womack [R-AR] | Rep. Elise Stefanik [R-NY] | Rep. Chris Collins [R-NY] | Rep. Vicky Hartzler [R-MO] |
Rep. Robert Aderholt [R-AL] | Rep. John Shimkus [R-IL] | Rep. Walter Jones [R-NC] | Rep. Lee Zeldin [R-NY] |
Rep. David Roe [R-TN] | Sen. Kevin Cramer [R-ND] | Rep. Eric Crawford [R-AR] | Rep. Garland Barr [R-KY] |
Rep. Glenn Grothman [R-WI] | Rep. Scott Tipton [R-CO] | Rep. Bradley Byrne [R-AL] | Rep. Matt Salmon [R-AZ] |
Rep. John Moolenaar [R-MI] | Rep. Brad Wenstrup [R-OH] | Rep. Bruce Westerman [R-AR] | Rep. Cresent Hardy [R-NV] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-11-16 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Early Childhood, Elementary, and Secondary Education. |
2015-03-19 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Education and the Workforce. |
2015-03-19 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB2508 (Related) 2015-11-16 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Early Childhood, Elementary, and Secondary Education.
SB1146 (Related) 2015-04-30 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Agriculture, Nutrition, and Forestry.
SB1146 (Related) 2015-04-30 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Agriculture, Nutrition, and Forestry.
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Agriculture and food
Child health
Department of Agriculture
Education
Elementary and secondary education
Food assistance and relief
Grain
Meat
Nutrition and diet
School administration
Agriculture and food
Child health
Department of Agriculture
Education
Elementary and secondary education
Food assistance and relief
Grain
Meat
Nutrition and diet
School administration
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/114th-congress/house-bill/1504/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/114/bills/hr1504/BILLS-114hr1504ih.pdf |