US HB150 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 23-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-02-21 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-02-21 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To prohibit a moratorium on the use of hydraulic fracturing.
Title
Protecting American Energy Production Act
Sponsors
Rep. Jeff Duncan [R-SC] | Rep. Guy Reschenthaler [R-PA] | Rep. Scott Perry [R-PA] | Rep. Ron Estes [R-KS] |
Rep. Randy Weber [R-TX] | Rep. Austin Scott [R-GA] | Rep. Andy Biggs [R-AZ] | Rep. Ralph Norman [R-SC] |
Rep. Ronny Jackson [R-TX] | Rep. Jerry Carl [R-AL] | Rep. Pete Stauber [R-MN] | Rep. David Kustoff [R-TN] |
Rep. Kelly Armstrong [R-ND] | Rep. Steve Womack [R-AR] | Rep. Brad Finstad [R-MN] | Rep. Lauren Boebert [R-CO] |
Rep. Andrew Ogles [R-TN] | Rep. David Valadao [R-CA] | Rep. Debbie Lesko [R-AZ] | Rep. Brian Babin [R-TX] |
Rep. Mike Bost [R-IL] | Rep. Troy Balderson [R-OH] | Rep. Mike Carey [R-OH] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-21 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources. |
2023-01-09 | House | Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2023-01-09 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy, Climate and Grid Security. |
2023-01-09 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB1121 (Same As) 2024-03-21 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
HB1 (Related) 2023-03-30 - The Clerk was authorized to correct section numbers, punctuation, and cross references, and to make other necessary technical and conforming corrections in the engrossment of H.R. 1.
SB947 (Related) 2023-03-22 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
HB2811 (Related) 2023-05-04 - Committee on the Budget. Hearings held.
HB1 (Related) 2023-03-30 - The Clerk was authorized to correct section numbers, punctuation, and cross references, and to make other necessary technical and conforming corrections in the engrossment of H.R. 1.
SB947 (Related) 2023-03-22 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
HB2811 (Related) 2023-05-04 - Committee on the Budget. Hearings held.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/118th-congress/house-bill/150/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/118/bills/hr150/BILLS-118hr150ih.pdf |