US HB1494 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on March 2 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-18 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 2 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-18 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To protect victims of stalking from gun violence.
Title
Zero Tolerance for Domestic Abusers Act
Sponsors
Rep. Debbie Dingell [D-MI] | Rep. Brian Fitzpatrick [R-PA] | Rep. Ro Khanna [D-CA] | Rep. Eric Swalwell [D-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-18 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security. |
2021-03-02 | House | Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary. |
2021-03-02 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB1620 (Related) 2022-05-24 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
SB527 (Related) 2021-03-02 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
SB1155 (Related) 2021-04-15 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S1985)
HB1906 (Related) 2021-05-18 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
SB527 (Related) 2021-03-02 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
SB1155 (Related) 2021-04-15 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S1985)
HB1906 (Related) 2021-05-18 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/house-bill/1494/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/hr1494/BILLS-117hr1494ih.pdf |