US SB527 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 37-2)
Status: Introduced on March 2 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-02 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 2 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-02 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to protect victims of stalking from gun violence.
Title
Protecting Domestic Violence and Stalking Victims Act of 2021
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-02 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1620 (Related) 2022-05-24 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
HB1494 (Related) 2021-05-18 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
SB1155 (Related) 2021-04-15 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S1985)
HB1906 (Related) 2021-05-18 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
HB1494 (Related) 2021-05-18 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
SB1155 (Related) 2021-04-15 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S1985)
HB1906 (Related) 2021-05-18 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/senate-bill/527/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/s527/BILLS-117s527is.pdf |