US HB1482 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Introduced on March 9 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-05-16 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 40.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 9 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-05-16 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 40.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To provide guidance for and investment in the upgrade and modernization of the National Oceanic and Atmospheric Administration Weather Radio All Hazards network, and for other purposes.
Title
NWR Modernization Act of 2023 NOAA Weather Radio Modernization Act of 2023
Sponsors
Rep. Stephanie Bice [R-OK] | Rep. Rebecca Sherrill [D-NJ] | Rep. Max Miller [R-OH] | Rep. Suzanne Bonamici [D-OR] |
Rep. Derek Kilmer [D-WA] | Rep. Jeff Jackson [D-NC] | Rep. Summer Lee [D-PA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-16 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 40. |
2023-05-16 | House | Reported by the Committee on Science, Space, and Technology. H. Rept. 118-60. |
2023-03-29 | House | Ordered to be Reported by the Yeas and Nays: 36 - 0. |
2023-03-29 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2023-03-09 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Science, Space, and Technology. |
2023-03-09 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB1416 (Related) 2023-12-22 - Held at the desk.
HB6093 (Related) 2024-05-01 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
HB6093 (Related) 2024-05-01 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.