US HB6093 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on October 26 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-12-11 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 247.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on October 26 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-12-11 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 247.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To improve the National Oceanic and Atmospheric Administration's weather research, support improvements in weather forecasting and prediction, expand commercial opportunities for the provision of weather data, and for other purposes.
Title
Weather Act Reauthorization Act of 2023 Weather Research and Forecasting Innovation Reauthorization Act of 2023
Sponsors
Rep. Frank Lucas [R-OK] | Rep. Zoe Lofgren [D-CA] | Rep. Max Miller [R-OH] | Rep. Randy Weber [R-TX] |
Rep. Brian Babin [R-TX] | Rep. James Baird [R-IN] | Rep. Mike Garcia [R-CA] | Rep. Stephanie Bice [R-OK] |
Rep. Jay Obernolte [R-CA] | Rep. Charles Fleischmann [R-TN] | Rep. Claudia Tenney [R-NY] | Rep. Richard McCormick [R-GA] |
Rep. Mike Collins [R-GA] | Rep. Thomas Kean [R-NJ] | Rep. Randy Feenstra [R-IA] | Rep. Nathaniel Moran [R-TX] |
Rep. Eric Crawford [R-AR] | Rep. Suzanne Bonamici [D-OR] | Rep. Valerie Foushee [D-NC] | Rep. Deborah Ross [D-NC] |
Rep. Jeff Jackson [D-NC] | Rep. Haley Stevens [D-MI] | Rep. Summer Lee [D-PA] | Rep. Eric Sorensen [D-IL] |
Rep. Darrell Issa [R-CA] | Rep. Emilia Sykes [D-OH] | Rep. Yadira Caraveo [D-CO] | Rep. Elissa Slotkin [D-MI] |
Rep. Jennifer McClellan [D-VA] | Rep. Maxwell Frost [D-FL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-12-11 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 247. |
2023-12-11 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Science, Space, and Technology. H. Rept. 118-306. |
2023-11-08 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 31 - 0. |
2023-11-08 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held |
2023-10-26 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Science, Space, and Technology. |
2023-10-26 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB1482 (Related) 2023-05-16 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 40.
HB2995 (Related) 2023-04-28 - Referred to the House Committee on Science, Space, and Technology.
HB3915 (Related) 2023-09-21 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 171.
HB4373 (Related) 2023-06-27 - Referred to the House Committee on Science, Space, and Technology.
HB4575 (Related) 2023-07-12 - Referred to the House Committee on Science, Space, and Technology.
HB6234 (Related) 2023-11-06 - Referred to the House Committee on Science, Space, and Technology.
SB1414 (Related) 2023-12-22 - Held at the desk.
HB6080 (Related) 2023-10-26 - Referred to the House Committee on Science, Space, and Technology.
HB2995 (Related) 2023-04-28 - Referred to the House Committee on Science, Space, and Technology.
HB3915 (Related) 2023-09-21 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 171.
HB4373 (Related) 2023-06-27 - Referred to the House Committee on Science, Space, and Technology.
HB4575 (Related) 2023-07-12 - Referred to the House Committee on Science, Space, and Technology.
HB6234 (Related) 2023-11-06 - Referred to the House Committee on Science, Space, and Technology.
SB1414 (Related) 2023-12-22 - Held at the desk.
HB6080 (Related) 2023-10-26 - Referred to the House Committee on Science, Space, and Technology.