US HB1480 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-10 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-10 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Safe and Affordable Drugs from Canada Act of 2017 This bill amends the Federal Food, Drug, and Cosmetic Act (FFDCA) to require the Department of Health and Human Services (HHS) to promulgate regulations within 180 days permitting individuals to import a prescription drug purchased from an approved Canadian pharmacy that: is dispensed by a pharmacist licensed in Canada; is purchased for personal use in quantities not greater than a 90-day supply; is filled using a valid prescription issued by a physician licensed to practice in the United States; and has the same active ingredients, route of administration, dosage form, and strength as a prescription drug approved under the FFDCA. Certain medications may not be imported, including controlled substances and biological products. The bill establishes a certification process for approving Canadian pharmacies. HHS must publish a list of approved Canadian pharmacies.
Title
Safe and Affordable Drugs from Canada Act of 2017
Sponsors
Rep. Chellie Pingree [D-ME] | Rep. Steve Cohen [D-TN] | Rep. Daniel Lipinski [D-IL] | Rep. Louise Slaughter [D-NY] |
Rep. John Garamendi [D-CA] | Rep. Zoe Lofgren [D-CA] | Rep. Dana Rohrabacher [R-CA] | Rep. Jaime Herrera Beutler [R-WA] |
Rep. Bill Posey [R-FL] | Rep. David Joyce [R-OH] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-10 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2017-03-09 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
2017-03-09 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB64 (Same As) 2017-01-09 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
SB92 (Related) 2017-01-10 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
SB92 (Related) 2017-01-10 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Canada
Department of Health and Human Services
Drug safety, medical device, and laboratory regulation
Government information and archives
Health
Prescription drugs
Trade restrictions
Canada
Department of Health and Human Services
Drug safety, medical device, and laboratory regulation
Government information and archives
Health
Prescription drugs
Trade restrictions
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/house-bill/1480/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/hr1480/BILLS-115hr1480ih.pdf |