US HB1423 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 221-2)
Status: Engrossed on September 24 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-09-24 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on September 24 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-09-24 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits a predispute arbitration agreement from being valid or enforceable if it requires arbitration of an employment, consumer, antitrust, or civil rights dispute.
Title
FAIR Act Forced Arbitration Injustice Repeal Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-09-20 - House - On passage RC# 540 (Y: 225 N: 186 NV: 23 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-20 - House - On agreeing to the Jordan amendment (A001) H.Amdt.621 RC# 539 (Y: 161 N: 253 NV: 26 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-09-20 - House - On agreeing to the Jordan amendment (A001) H.Amdt.621 RC# 539 (Y: 161 N: 253 NV: 26 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-09-24 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. |
2019-09-20 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2019-09-20 | House | On passage Passed by recorded vote: 225 - 186 (Roll no. 540). (text: CR H7848-7849) |
2019-09-20 | House | The previous question was ordered pursuant to the rule. |
2019-09-20 | House | The House rose from the Committee of the Whole House on the state of the Union to report H.R. 1423. |
2019-09-20 | House | H.Amdt.621 On agreeing to the Jordan amendment (A001) Failed by recorded vote: 161 - 253 (Roll no. 539). |
2019-09-20 | House | H.Amdt.622 On agreeing to the Fletcher amendment (A002) Agreed to by voice vote. |
2019-09-20 | House | DEBATE - Pursuant to the provisions of H.Res. 558, the Committee of the Whole proceeded with 10 minutes of debate on the Fletcher amendment No. 2. |
2019-09-20 | House | H.Amdt.622 Amendment (A002) offered by Mrs. Fletcher. (consideration: CR H7850-7851; text: CR H7850) |
2019-09-20 | House | POSTPONED PROCEEDINGS - At the conclusion of debate on the Jordan amendment, the Chair put the question on the amendment and by voice vote, announced that the noes had prevailed. Mr. Jordan demanded a recorded vote and the Chair postponed further proceedings on agreeing to the amendment until a time to be announced. |
2019-09-20 | House | DEBATE - Pursuant to the provisions of H.Res. 558, the Committee of the Whole proceeded with 10 minutes of debate on the Jordan amendment No. 1. |
2019-09-20 | House | H.Amdt.621 Amendment (A001) offered by Mr. Jordan. (consideration: CR H7849-7850, H7851-7852; text: CR H7849) |
2019-09-20 | House | GENERAL DEBATE - The Committee of the Whole proceeded with one hour of general debate on H.R. 1423. |
2019-09-20 | House | The Speaker designated the Honorable Lauren Underwood to act as Chairwoman of the Committee. |
2019-09-20 | House | House resolved itself into the Committee of the Whole House on the state of the Union pursuant to H. Res. 558 and Rule XVIII. |
2019-09-20 | House | Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 1423 with 1 hour of general debate. Previous question shall be considered as ordered without intervening motions except motion to recommit with or without instructions. Measure will be considered read. Specified amendments are in order. The resolution waives the requirement of clause 6(a) of rule XIII for a two-thirds vote to consider a report from the Committee on Rules on the same day it is presented to the House with respect to any resolution reported through the legislative day of September 20, 2019, relating to a measure making or continuing appropriations for the fiscal year ending September 30, 2020. The resolution provides that it shall be in order at any time on the legislative day of September 19, 2019, or September 20, 2019, for the Speaker to entertain motions that the House suspend the rules. |
2019-09-20 | House | Considered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 558. (consideration: CR H7840-7853) |
2019-09-18 | House | Rule H. Res. 558 passed House. |
2019-09-17 | House | Rules Committee Resolution H. Res. 558 Reported to House. Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 1423 with 1 hour of general debate. Previous question shall be considered as ordered without intervening motions except motion to recommit with or without instructions. Measure will be considered read. Specified amendments are in order. The resolution waives the requirement of clause 6(a) of rule XIII for a two-thirds vote to consider a report from the Committee on Rules on the same day it is presented to the House with respect to any resolution reported through the legislative day of September 20, 2019, relating to a measure making or continuing appropriations for the fiscal year ending September 30, 2020. The resolution provides that it shall be in order at any time on the legislative day of September 19, 2019, or September 20, 2019, for the Speaker to entertain motions that the House suspend the rules. |
2019-09-13 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 161. |
2019-09-13 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Judiciary. H. Rept. 116-204. |
2019-09-10 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 22 - 14. |
2019-09-10 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2019-09-10 | House | Subcommittee on Antitrust, Commercial, and Administrative Law Discharged. |
2019-04-08 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Antitrust, Commercial, and Administrative Law. |
2019-02-28 | House | Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary. |
2019-02-28 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB610 (Related) 2019-02-28 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
HR558 (Related) 2019-09-18 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HB8698 (Related) 2020-10-27 - Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committee on Education and Labor, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
HR558 (Related) 2019-09-18 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HB8698 (Related) 2020-10-27 - Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committee on Education and Labor, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Subjects
Age discrimination
Alternative dispute resolution, mediation, arbitration
Civil actions and liability
Competition and antitrust
Consumer credit
Disability and health-based discrimination
Employment discrimination and employee rights
Housing discrimination
Labor-management relations
Law
Racial and ethnic relations
Sex, gender, sexual orientation discrimination
Voting rights
Alternative dispute resolution, mediation, arbitration
Civil actions and liability
Competition and antitrust
Consumer credit
Disability and health-based discrimination
Employment discrimination and employee rights
Housing discrimination
Labor-management relations
Law
Racial and ethnic relations
Sex, gender, sexual orientation discrimination
Voting rights