US HB1365 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on March 26 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-26 - Became Public Law No: 116-132. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on March 26 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-26 - Became Public Law No: 116-132. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies the use of amounts deposited in the Guam World War II Claims Fund, which is used to pay claims of victims and survivors of the attack and occupation of Guam by Imperial Japanese military forces and the liberation of Guam by U.S. military forces. Currently, claims are paid subject to the availability of appropriations. removes the requirement for appropriations.
Title
To make technical corrections to the Guam World War II Loyalty Recognition Act.
Sponsors
Rep. Michael San Nicolas [D-GU] | Rep. Ilhan Omar [D-MN] | Rep. Jamie Raskin [D-MD] | Rep. Don Bacon [R-NE] |
Rep. Sylvia Garcia [D-TX] | Rep. John Shimkus [R-IL] | Rep. Raul Grijalva [D-AZ] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-26 | House | Became Public Law No: 116-132. (TXT | PDF) |
2020-03-26 | House | Signed by President. |
2020-03-16 | House | Presented to President. |
2020-03-09 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2020-03-09 | House | On motion that the House suspend the rules and agree to the Senate amendment Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H1542) |
2020-03-09 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on the motion to suspend the rules and agree to the Senate amendment to H.R. 1365. |
2020-03-09 | House | Mr. San Nicolas moved that the House suspend the rules and agree to the Senate amendment. (consideration: CR H1542-1543) |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Passed Senate with an amendment by Voice Vote. (text of amendment in the nature of a substitute: CR S1045) |
2020-02-12 | Senate | S.Amdt.1323 Amendment SA 1323 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent. |
2020-02-12 | Senate | S.Amdt.1323 Amendment SA 1323 proposed by Senator Cramer for Senator Graham. (consideration: CR S1045; text: CR S1045) In the nature of a substitute. |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S1045) |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Senate Committee on the Judiciary discharged by Unanimous Consent. |
2019-07-25 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. |
2019-07-24 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2019-07-24 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H7351) |
2019-07-24 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1365. |
2019-07-24 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H7351-7353) |
2019-07-24 | House | Mr. San Nicolas moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2019-07-11 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 111. |
2019-07-11 | House | Reported by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 116-149. |
2019-06-19 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote. |
2019-06-19 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2019-02-26 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
2019-02-26 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Administrative remedies
Armed forces and national security
Asia
Crime victims
Government trust funds
Guam
War and emergency powers
War crimes, genocide, crimes against humanity
World history
Armed forces and national security
Asia
Crime victims
Government trust funds
Guam
War and emergency powers
War crimes, genocide, crimes against humanity
World history