US HB1353 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-22 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Science, And Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-22 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Science, And Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Transparency in Technological Acquisitions Act of 2017 (Sec. 2) This bill amends the Homeland Security Act of 2002 to require the Transportation Security Administration (TSA) to submit annually (currently, biennially): an update to its strategic five-year technology investment plan, and a report on the extent to which security-related technology acquired since the last issuance or update of the plan is consistent with the planned technology programs and projects identified for that security-related technology. The TSA shall also include information about acquisitions completed during the fiscal year preceding the fiscal year during which such report is submitted. The TSA shall: report to Congress on any TSA equipment that is operating after the end of its life-cycle or the end of its useful life projection under the plan, and notify airports and airlines of any changes to the plan.
Title
Transparency in Technological Acquisitions Act of 2017
Sponsors
Rep. Kathleen Rice [D-NY] | Rep. Bonnie Coleman [D-NJ] | Rep. William Keating [D-MA] | Rep. John Katko [R-NY] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-21 - House - On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill RC# 178 (Y: 414 N: 2 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-22 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. |
2017-03-21 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2017-03-21 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 414 - 2 (Roll no. 178). |
2017-03-21 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H2259-2260) |
2017-03-20 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2017-03-20 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1353. |
2017-03-20 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H2212-2213; text of measure as introduced: CR H2212) |
2017-03-20 | House | Mr. Rutherford moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2017-03-20 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 24. |
2017-03-20 | House | Reported by the Committee on Homeland Security. H. Rept. 115-44. |
2017-03-08 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote. |
2017-03-08 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2017-03-02 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Homeland Security. |
2017-03-02 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Aviation and airports
Computers and information technology
Congressional oversight
Department of Homeland Security
Government studies and investigations
Public contracts and procurement
Transportation and public works
Transportation safety and security
Computers and information technology
Congressional oversight
Department of Homeland Security
Government studies and investigations
Public contracts and procurement
Transportation and public works
Transportation safety and security