US HB132 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-04-23 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health, Employment, Labor, and Pensions.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health, Employment, Labor, and Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-04-23 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health, Employment, Labor, and Pensions.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health, Employment, Labor, and Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
ObamaCare Repeal Act - Repeals the Patient Protection and Affordable Care Act and the Health Care and Education Reconciliation Act of 2010, effective as of their enactment. Restores provisions of law amended by such Acts.
Title
ObamaCare Repeal Act
Sponsors
Rep. Steve King [R-IA] | Rep. Billy Long [R-MO] | Rep. Steven Palazzo [R-MS] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-23 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health, Employment, Labor, and Pensions. |
2013-04-23 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Higher Education and Workforce Training. |
2013-01-31 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee Indian and Alaska Native Affairs. |
2013-01-15 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2013-01-04 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2013-01-03 | House | Referred to House Appropriations |
2013-01-03 | House | Referred to House Rules |
2013-01-03 | House | Referred to House House Administration |
2013-01-03 | House | Referred to House Natural Resources |
2013-01-03 | House | Referred to House Judiciary |
2013-01-03 | House | Referred to House Education and the Workforce |
2013-01-03 | House | Referred to House Ways and Means |
2013-01-03 | House | Referred to House Energy and Commerce |
2013-01-03 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, Education and the Workforce, the Judiciary, Natural Resources, House Administration, Rules, and Appropriations, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
Same As/Similar To
SB177 (Related) 2013-01-30 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 9.
HB351 (Related) 2013-01-28 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
HB3355 (Related) 2014-01-24 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Intelligence, Emerging Threats & Capabilities.
HB3165 (Related) 2014-01-09 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution and Civil Justice.
HB3121 (Related) 2014-01-22 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health, Employment, Labor, and Pensions.
HB351 (Related) 2013-01-28 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
HB3355 (Related) 2014-01-24 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Intelligence, Emerging Threats & Capabilities.
HB3165 (Related) 2014-01-09 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution and Civil Justice.
HB3121 (Related) 2014-01-22 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health, Employment, Labor, and Pensions.
Subjects
Comprehensive health care
Government lending and loan guarantees
Health
Health care costs and insurance
Health care coverage and access
Higher education
Student aid and college costs
Government lending and loan guarantees
Health
Health care costs and insurance
Health care coverage and access
Higher education
Student aid and college costs
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/113th-congress/house-bill/132/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/113/bills/hr132/BILLS-113hr132ih.pdf |