US HB1281 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-7)
Status: Introduced on March 1 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-07 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Federal Lands.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Federal Lands Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 1 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-07 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Federal Lands.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Federal Lands Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To extend the authorization of the Highlands Conservation Act. This bill amends the Highlands Conservation Act to reauthorize through FY2021 financial assistance for land conservation partnership projects in the highlands regions of Connecticut, New Jersey, New York, and Pennsylvania.
Title
To extend the authorization of the Highlands Conservation Act.
Sponsors
Rep. Rodney Frelinghuysen [R-NJ] | Rep. Leonard Lance [R-NJ] | Rep. Ryan Costello [R-PA] | Rep. Eliot Engel [D-NY] |
Rep. Patrick Meehan [R-PA] | Rep. Paul Tonko [D-NY] | Rep. Bill Pascrell [D-NJ] | Rep. Sean Maloney [D-NY] |
Rep. Matthew Cartwright [D-PA] | Rep. John Faso [R-NY] | Rep. Elizabeth Esty [D-CT] | Rep. Nita Lowey [D-NY] |
Rep. Albio Sires [D-NJ] | Rep. John Larson [D-CT] | Rep. Thomas MacArthur [R-NJ] | Rep. Christopher Smith [R-NJ] |
Rep. Donald Payne [D-NJ] | Rep. Donald Norcross [D-NJ] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-07 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Federal Lands. |
2017-03-01 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
2017-03-01 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB1627 (Related) 2017-07-25 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
HB1625 (Related) 2018-03-23 - Became Public Law No: 115-141.
HB1625 (Related) 2018-03-23 - Became Public Law No: 115-141.
Subjects
Connecticut
Department of the Interior
Executive agency funding and structure
Forests, forestry, trees
Land use and conservation
New Jersey
New York State
Pennsylvania
Public lands and natural resources
Water quality
Watersheds
Wildlife conservation and habitat protection
Department of the Interior
Executive agency funding and structure
Forests, forestry, trees
Land use and conservation
New Jersey
New York State
Pennsylvania
Public lands and natural resources
Water quality
Watersheds
Wildlife conservation and habitat protection
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/house-bill/1281/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/hr1281/BILLS-115hr1281ih.pdf |