US HB1228 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 3 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-03 - Became Public Law No: 115-19. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 3 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-03 - Became Public Law No: 115-19. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
To provide for the appointment of members of the Board of Directors of the Office of Compliance to replace members whose terms expire during 2017, and for other purposes. (Sec. 1) This bill provides that of the three members appointed to the Board of Directors of the Office of Compliance (OOC) to replace the three members whose terms expire in March 2017, one shall have a three-year term and two shall have a four-year term. (The OOC was established by the Congressional Accountability Act of 1995 to administer and enforce that Act and to assist Members of Congress in understanding their rights and responsibilities under workplace and accessibility laws.) The board members appointed to replace the two members whose terms expire in May 2017 shall each have a five-year term. This bill allows a board member whose term expires in: (1) March 2017 to be reappointed to serve one additional three or four-year term, and (2) May 2017 to be reappointed to serve an additional five-year term. Such board members may not be reappointed to any additional terms after their additional term expires. The bill amends the Congressional Accountability Act of 1995 to: (1) permit a board member to serve after his or her term has expired until a successor has taken office; and (2) authorize the Speaker of the House of Representatives, the Majority Leader of the Senate, and the Minority Leaders of the House and Senate to take such steps as they consider appropriate to ensure the timely appointment of board members consistent with such Act's requirements.
Title
To provide for the appointment of members of the Board of Directors of the Office of Compliance to replace members whose terms expire during 2017, and for other purposes.
Sponsors
Rep. Gregg Harper [R-MS] | Rep. Robert Brady [D-PA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-03 | Senate | Became Public Law No: 115-19. (TXT | PDF) |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Signed by President. |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Presented to President. |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Received in the Senate, read twice, considered, read the third time, and passed without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S1897) |
2017-03-15 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2017-03-15 | House | On passage Passed without objection. |
2017-03-15 | House | H.Amdt.80 On agreeing to the Harper amendment (A001) Agreed to by voice vote. |
2017-03-15 | House | H.Amdt.80 Amendment (A001) offered by Mr. Harper. (consideration: CR H2071; text: CR H2071) |
2017-03-15 | House | Committee on House Administration discharged. (consideration: CR H2071; text: CR H2071) |
2017-03-15 | House | Mr. Harper asked unanimous consent to discharge from committee and consider. |
2017-02-27 | House | Referred to the House Committee on House Administration. |
2017-02-27 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Congress
Congressional agencies
Congressional leadership
Congressional officers and employees
Employment discrimination and employee rights
Federal officials
Worker safety and health
Congressional agencies
Congressional leadership
Congressional officers and employees
Employment discrimination and employee rights
Federal officials
Worker safety and health