US HB1192 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Passed on January 20 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-01-20 - Became Public Law No: 117-82.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Passed on January 20 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-01-20 - Became Public Law No: 117-82.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
To impose requirements on the payment of compensation to professional persons employed in voluntary cases commenced under title III of the Puerto Rico Oversight Management and Economic Stability Act (commonly known as "PROMESA").
Title
Puerto Rico Recovery Accuracy in Disclosures Act of 2021 PRRADA
Sponsors
Rep. Nydia Velazquez [D-NY] | Rep. Andy Biggs [R-AZ] | Rep. Jamie Raskin [D-MD] | Rep. Raul Grijalva [D-AZ] |
Rep. David Cicilline [D-RI] | Rep. Pramila Jayapal [D-WA] | Rep. Jenniffer Gonzalez-Colon [R-PR] | Rep. Darren Soto [D-FL] |
Rep. Eric Swalwell [D-CA] |
Roll Calls
2021-02-24 - House - On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill (Y: 429 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-20 | House | Became Public Law No: 117-82. |
2022-01-20 | House | Signed by President. |
2022-01-19 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2022-01-19 | House | On motion that the House suspend the rules and agree to the Senate amendment Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H230-231) |
2022-01-19 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on motion to agree to the Senate amendment to H.R. 1192. |
2022-01-19 | House | Ms. Dean moved that the House suspend the rules and agree to the Senate amendment. (consideration: CR H230-232) |
2022-01-19 | House | Presented to President. |
2022-01-19 | House | Resolving differences -- House actions: On motion that the House suspend the rules and agree to the Senate amendment Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H230-231) |
2021-12-20 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2021-12-18 | Senate | Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S9307-9308; text: CR S9307-9308) |
2021-12-13 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 182. |
2021-12-13 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Manchin with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 117-48. Additional views filed. |
2021-11-18 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably. |
2021-07-29 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Hearings held. |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. |
2021-02-24 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2021-02-24 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 429 - 0 (Roll no. 37). (text: 02/23/2020 CR H560-561) |
2021-02-24 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H611-612) |
2021-02-23 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2021-02-23 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1192. |
2021-02-23 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H560-563) |
2021-02-23 | House | Ms. Jackson Lee moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2021-02-22 | House | Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary. |
2021-02-22 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB375 (Same As) 2021-07-29 - Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Hearings held.