US HB1189 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on March 2 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-27 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 2 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-27 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Preserving Employee Wellness Programs Act This bill declares that a workplace wellness program, by offering a reward to participants, does not violate the Americans with Disabilities Act of 1990 or title I or II of the Genetic Information Nondiscrimination Act of 2008 if the program complies with Public Health Service Act requirements. Collection of information about a family member's manifested disease or disorder is not considered an unlawful acquisition of genetic information with respect to another family member participating in a workplace wellness program. This bill takes effect as if enacted on March 23, 2010.
Title
Preserving Employee Wellness Programs Act
Sponsors
Rep. John Kline [R-MN] | Rep. David Roe [R-TN] | Rep. Tim Walberg [R-MI] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-27 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2015-03-24 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2015-03-24 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Workforce Protections. |
2015-03-02 | House | Referred to House Ways and Means |
2015-03-02 | House | Referred to House Energy and Commerce |
2015-03-02 | House | Referred to House Education and the Workforce |
2015-03-02 | House | Referred to the Committee on Education and the Workforce, and in addition to the Committees on Energy and Commerce, and Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2015-03-02 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB620 (Same As) 2015-03-02 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Department of Health and Human Services
Department of Labor
Department of the Treasury
Disability and health-based discrimination
Employee benefits and pensions
Genetics
Health
Health care costs and insurance
Health information and medical records
Health promotion and preventive care
Department of Health and Human Services
Department of Labor
Department of the Treasury
Disability and health-based discrimination
Employee benefits and pensions
Genetics
Health
Health care costs and insurance
Health information and medical records
Health promotion and preventive care
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/114th-congress/house-bill/1189/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/114/bills/hr1189/BILLS-114hr1189ih.pdf |