US HB1163 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 16 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-10 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Conservation and Forestry.
Pending: House Conservation and Forestry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-10 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Conservation and Forestry.
Pending: House Conservation and Forestry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Improving Access to Farm Conservation Act of 2017 This bill amends the Food Security Act of 1985 to exempt certain recipients of Department of Agriculture (USDA) conservation assistance from specified reporting requirements. The bill exempts producers or landowners eligible to participate in any USDA conservation program from reporting requirements related to subawards, executive compensation, the Universal Identifier, and the System for Award Management.
Title
Improving Access to Farm Conservation Act of 2017
Sponsors
Rep. Ann Kuster [D-NH] | Rep. Eric Crawford [R-AR] | Rep. Ralph Abraham [R-LA] | Rep. Michelle Lujan Grisham [D-NM] |
Rep. Tom O'Halleran [D-AZ] | Rep. Timothy Walz [D-MN] | Rep. Jamie Raskin [D-MD] | Rep. Mike Bost [R-IL] |
Rep. David Young [R-IA] | Rep. Andy Harris [R-MD] | Rep. Steven Palazzo [R-MS] | Rep. Richard Nolan [D-MN] |
Rep. Mark Pocan [D-WI] | Rep. Vicky Hartzler [R-MO] | Sen. Peter Welch [D-VT] | Rep. Ron Kind [D-WI] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-10 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Conservation and Forestry. |
2017-02-16 | House | Referred to the Committee on Agriculture, and in addition to the Committee on Oversight and Government Reform, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-02-16 | House | Referred to the Committee on Agriculture, and in addition to the Committee on Oversight and Government Reform, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-02-16 | House | Referred to the Committee on Agriculture, and in addition to the Committee on Oversight and Government Reform, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-02-16 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB364 (Same As) 2017-02-13 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
SB1603 (Related) 2017-07-20 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 177.
HB1625 (Similar To) 2018-03-23 - Became Public Law No: 115-141.
SB1603 (Related) 2017-07-20 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 177.
HB1625 (Similar To) 2018-03-23 - Became Public Law No: 115-141.
Subjects
Agricultural conservation and pollution
Agricultural prices, subsidies, credit
Agriculture and food
Government information and archives
Agricultural prices, subsidies, credit
Agriculture and food
Government information and archives
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/house-bill/1163/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/hr1163/BILLS-115hr1163ih.pdf |