US HB1157 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 9-5)
Status: Introduced on February 27 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-09-06 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 554.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-09-06 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 554.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Santa Ynez Band of Chumash Mission Indians Land Transfer Act of 2016 (Sec. 2) This bill directs the Department of the Interior to take specified lands in Santa Barbara County, California, into trust for the Santa Ynez Band of Chumash Mission Indians, subject to valid existing rights and to the terms in a certain stipulated judgment relating to a specified easement, if the Tribe transfers title to that land to the United States. (Placing that land into trust removes certain restrictions on the property under California law.) The transferred land shall become part of the Santa Ynez Indian Reservation. No gaming may be conducted on the land.
Title
Santa Ynez Band of Chumash Mission Indians Land Transfer Act of 2016
Sponsors
Rep. Doug LaMalfa [R-CA] | Rep. Tony Cardenas [D-CA] | Rep. Devin Nunes [R-CA] | Rep. Tom Cole [R-OK] |
Rep. Betty McCollum [D-MN] | Rep. Jeff Denham [R-CA] | Rep. Paul Cook [R-CA] | Rep. David Valadao [R-CA] |
Rep. Tom McClintock [R-CA] | Rep. Norma Torres [D-CA] | Rep. Juan Vargas [D-CA] | Rep. Mimi Walters [R-CA] |
Rep. Stephen Knight [R-CA] | Rep. Raul Ruiz [D-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-06 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 554. |
2016-09-06 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 114-715. |
2016-07-13 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 29 - 1. |
2016-07-13 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2016-07-12 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2016-07-12 | House | Subcommittee on Indian, Insular and Alaska Native Affairs Discharged. |
2015-06-17 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2015-03-23 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Indian, Insular and Alaska Native Affairs. |
2015-02-27 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
2015-02-27 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
California
Federal-Indian relations
Gambling
Indian lands and resources rights
Land transfers
Native Americans
Federal-Indian relations
Gambling
Indian lands and resources rights
Land transfers
Native Americans