US HB1108 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-03-03 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Communications and Technology.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Communications and Technology Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-03-03 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Communications and Technology.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Communications and Technology Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To amend the Communications Act of 1934 to extend the authority of the Federal Communications Commission to grant a license or construction permit through a system of competitive bidding.
Title
To amend the Communications Act of 1934 to extend the authority of the Federal Communications Commission to grant a license or construction permit through a system of competitive bidding.
Sponsors
Rep. Cathy McMorris Rodgers [R-WA] | Rep. Frank Pallone [D-NJ] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-03 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Communications and Technology. |
2023-02-28 | Senate | Received in the Senate. |
2023-02-27 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2023-02-27 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. |
2023-02-27 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1108. |
2023-02-27 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. |
2023-02-27 | House | Mr. Latta moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2023-02-21 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
2023-02-21 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB650 (Related) 2023-03-02 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
HB3345 (Related) 2023-05-17 - Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote .
HB3345 (Related) 2023-05-17 - Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote .