US HB1093 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on September 28 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-09-28 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Science, And Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on September 28 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-09-28 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Science, And Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To require the Federal Railroad Administration and the Federal Transit Authority to provide appropriate Congressional notice of safety audits conducted with respect to railroads and rail transit agencies. (Sec. 1) This bill requires the Federal Railroad Administration: (1) within 10 days after it initiates a comprehensive safety assessment of an entity providing regularly scheduled intercity or commuter rail passenger service, to notify specified congressional committees and each Member of Congress representing a state in which the service that is the subject of the assessment being conducted is located, of the initiation of that assessment; and (2) within 90 days after completing such assessment, to report the findings of such assessment to such committees and Members.
Title
To require the Federal Railroad Administration and the Federal Transit Authority to provide appropriate Congressional notice of safety audits conducted with respect to railroads and rail transit agencies.
Sponsors
Rep. Albio Sires [D-NJ] | Rep. Donald Payne [D-NJ] | Rep. Elizabeth Esty [D-CT] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-28 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. |
2018-09-27 | House | The title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection. |
2018-09-27 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2018-09-27 | House | On passage Passed without objection. (text: CR H9138; text of amendment in the nature of a substitute: CR H9138-9139) |
2018-09-27 | House | Considered by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR H9138-9139) |
2018-09-27 | House | Mr. Denham asked unanimous consent to take from the Speaker's table and consider. |
2018-03-13 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 452. |
2018-03-13 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. H. Rept. 115-594. |
2017-03-29 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2017-03-29 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2017-03-29 | House | Subcommittee on Railroads, Pipelines, and Hazardous Materials Discharged. |
2017-03-29 | House | Subcommittee on Highways and Transit Discharged. |
2017-02-16 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Highways and Transit. |
2017-02-16 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Railroads, Pipelines, and Hazardous Materials. |
2017-02-15 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. |
2017-02-15 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Congressional oversight
Government studies and investigations
Public transit
Railroads
Transportation and public works
Transportation safety and security
Government studies and investigations
Public transit
Railroads
Transportation and public works
Transportation safety and security