US HB1073 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 19-1)
Status: Engrossed on November 17 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-11-17 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
Pending: Senate Homeland Security And Governmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on November 17 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-11-17 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
Pending: Senate Homeland Security And Governmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
CIPA Critical Infrastructure Protection Act (Sec. 2) Amends the Homeland Security Act of 2002 to define "EMP" to mean: (1) an electromagnetic pulse caused by intentional means, including acts of terrorism; and (2) a geomagnetic disturbance caused by solar storms or other naturally occurring phenomena. Directs DHS to: (1) include in national planning frameworks the threat of EMP events; and (2) conduct outreach to educate owners and operators of critical infrastructure, emergency planners, and emergency response providers of the threat of EMP events. Directs DHS to conduct research and development to mitigate the consequences of EMP events, including: (1) an objective scientific analysis of the risks to critical infrastructures from a range of EMP events; (2) determination of the critical national security assets and vital civic utilities and infrastructures that are at risk from EMP events; (3) an evaluation of emergency planning and response technologies that would address the findings and recommendations of experts, including those of the Commission to Assess the Threat to the United States from Electromagnetic Pulse Attack; (4) an analysis of available technology options to improve the resiliency of critical infrastructure to EMP; and (5) the restoration and recovery capabilities of critical infrastructure under differing levels of damage and disruption from various EMP events. Includes among the responsibilities of DHS relating to intelligence and analysis and infrastructure protection, to prepare and submit to specified congressional committees: (1) a recommended strategy to protect and prepare the critical infrastructure of the American homeland against EMP events, and (2) biennial updates on the status of such strategy. Requires DHS to report within 180 days after enactment of this Act on the progress made in meeting, and on an estimated date for completing, the requirements set forth under this Act.
Title
CIPA Critical Infrastructure Protection Act
Sponsors
Rep. Trent Franks [R-AZ] | Rep. Pete Sessions [R-TX] | Rep. Ron DeSantis [R-FL] | Rep. John Kline [R-MN] |
Rep. Chris Stewart [R-UT] | Rep. Robert Pittenger [R-NC] | Rep. Joe Wilson [R-SC] | Rep. Steve Chabot [R-OH] |
Rep. Stephen Fincher [R-TN] | Rep. Brian Babin [R-TX] | Rep. Paul Cook [R-CA] | Rep. Doug Lamborn [R-CO] |
Rep. John Duncan [R-TN] | Rep. Randy Weber [R-TX] | Rep. David Roe [R-TN] | Rep. David Schweikert [R-AZ] |
Sen. Marsha Blackburn [R-TN] | Rep. John Garamendi [D-CA] | Rep. Vicky Hartzler [R-MO] | Rep. Steve King [R-IA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-11-17 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. |
2015-11-16 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2015-11-16 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H8171-8172) |
2015-11-16 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1073. |
2015-11-16 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H8171-8174) |
2015-11-16 | House | Mr. Carter (GA) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2015-08-04 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 181. |
2015-08-04 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Homeland Security. H. Rept. 114-240. |
2015-06-25 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2015-06-25 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2015-03-12 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Cybersecurity, Infrastructure Protection, and Security Technologies. |
2015-02-25 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Homeland Security. |
2015-02-25 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB1846 (Related) 2016-05-09 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 457.
Subjects
Astronomy
Congressional oversight
Electric power generation and transmission
Emergency management
Emergency planning and evacuation
Government studies and investigations
Homeland security
Natural disasters
Research and development
Terrorism
Congressional oversight
Electric power generation and transmission
Emergency management
Emergency planning and evacuation
Government studies and investigations
Homeland security
Natural disasters
Research and development
Terrorism