US HB107 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-25 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-25 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Terminates certain limitations regarding drug rebates under Medicaid. Currently, the maximum rebate that drug manufacturers must pay under Medicaid for single-source and innovator multiple-source drugs is 100% of the average manufacturer price of the drug. The bill specifies that this limitation only applies to rebate periods that begin before January 1, 2020.
Title
To amend title XIX of the Social Security Act to sunset the limit on the maximum rebate amount for single source drugs and innovator multiple source drugs.
Sponsors
Rep. Michael Burgess [R-TX] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-25 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2019-01-03 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
2019-01-03 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB4996 (Related) 2020-09-30 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/107/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr107/BILLS-116hr107ih.pdf |