US HB1054 | 2009-2010 | 111th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 34-4)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-09-22 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-09-22 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Directs the Secretary of the Interior to issue a permit for the importation of polar bear parts taken in a sport hunt in Canada, if legally harvested before: (1) February 18, 1997; or (2) May 15, 2008, from a bear population from which a sport-hunted trophy could be imported before such date. (Polar bears were listed as a threatened species by the Department of the Interior on May 14, 2008.)
Title
To amend the Marine Mammal Protection Act of 1972 to allow importation of polar bear trophies taken in sport hunts in Canada before the date the polar bear was determined to be a threatened species under the Endangered Species Act of 1973.
Sponsors
Rep. Michael Arcuri [D-NY] | Rep. Michele Bachmann [R-MN] | Rep. Rob Bishop [R-UT] | Rep. Dan Boren [D-OK] |
Rep. Paul Broun [R-GA] | Rep. Ken Calvert [R-CA] | Rep. John Carter [R-TX] | Sen. Bill Cassidy [R-LA] |
Rep. Jason Chaffetz [R-UT] | Rep. Mike Coffman [R-CO] | Rep. Michael Conaway [R-TX] | Rep. Nathan Deal [R-GA] |
Rep. John Duncan [R-TN] | Sen. Jeff Flake [R-AZ] | Rep. Louie Gohmert [R-TX] | Rep. Wally Herger [R-CA] |
Rep. Ron Kind [D-WI] | Rep. Steve King [R-IA] | Rep. John Kline [R-MN] | Rep. Doug Lamborn [R-CO] |
Sen. Cynthia Lummis [R-WY] | Rep. Donald Manzullo [R-IL] | Rep. Kenny Marchant [R-TX] | Rep. Michael McCaul [R-TX] |
Rep. Tom McClintock [R-CA] | Rep. Jeff Miller [R-FL] | Rep. Erik Paulsen [R-MN] | Rep. Thomas Petri [R-WI] |
Rep. Joseph Pitts [R-PA] | Rep. Denny Rehberg [R-MT] | Rep. Bill Shuster [R-PA] | Rep. Michael Simpson [R-ID] |
Rep. Adrian Smith [R-NE] | Rep. Harry Teague [D-NM] | Rep. Todd Tiahrt [R-KS] | Rep. Greg Walden [R-OR] |
Rep. Robert Wittman [R-VA] | Rep. Don Young [R-AK] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-09-22 | Subcommittee Hearings Held. | |
2009-02-20 | Referred to the Subcommittee on Insular Affairs, Oceans and Wildlife. | |
2009-02-12 | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1395 (Related) 2009-07-06 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
Subjects
Animal protection and human-animal relationships
Animals
Canada
Endangered and threatened species
Mammals
Outdoor recreation
Trade restrictions
Animals
Canada
Endangered and threatened species
Mammals
Outdoor recreation
Trade restrictions
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/111th-congress/house-bill/1054/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/111/bills/hr1054/BILLS-111hr1054ih.pdf |