US HB1026 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-28 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-28 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To amend the Controlled Substances Act to require dispensers of certain opioids and opiates to affix on the container or package thereof a clear, concise warning that the opioid or opiate can cause dependence, addiction, and overdose, and for other purposes.
Title
LABEL Opioids Act Lessening Addiction By Enhancing Labeling Opioids Act of 2021
Sponsors
Rep. Greg Stanton [D-AZ] | Rep. Mary Gay Scanlon [D-PA] | Rep. Jeff Van Drew [R-NJ] | Rep. Jahana Hayes [D-CT] |
Rep. Josh Harder [D-CA] | Rep. Don Bacon [R-NE] | Rep. Tom O'Halleran [D-AZ] | Rep. Pramila Jayapal [D-WA] |
Rep. Kathy Manning [D-NC] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-28 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security. |
2021-02-12 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2021-02-11 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2021-02-11 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB2353 (Related) 2021-07-15 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/house-bill/1026/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/hr1026/BILLS-117hr1026ih.pdf |