US HB1026 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 16 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-04-16 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 16 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-04-16 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Taxpayer Knowledge of IRS Investigations Act (Sec. 2) Amends the Internal Revenue Code to authorize the Department of the Treasury to disclose to any person who provides information indicating a violation of internal revenue laws relating to unauthorized disclosure or inspection of tax information or to unlawful acts of revenue officers or agents: (1) whether an investigation based on such information has been initiated and is open or closed; (2) whether any such investigation substantiated a violation; and (3) whether any action has been taken against a violator, including a referral for prosecution. Makes this Act applicable to disclosures made on or after its enactment date.
Title
Taxpayer Knowledge of IRS Investigations Act
Sponsors
Rep. Mike Kelly [R-PA] | Rep. Charles Boustany [R-LA] | Rep. Peter Roskam [R-IL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-16 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance. |
2015-04-15 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2015-04-15 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H2233) |
2015-04-15 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1026. |
2015-04-15 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H2233-2235) |
2015-04-15 | House | Mr. Ryan (WI) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2015-04-13 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 48. |
2015-04-13 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Ways and Means. H. Rept. 114-68. |
2015-03-25 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2015-03-25 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2015-02-24 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means. |
2015-02-24 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB2029 (Related) 2015-12-18 - Became Public Law No: 114-113. (TXT | PDF)
Subjects
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Department of the Treasury
Employee performance
Evidence and witnesses
Government ethics and transparency, public corruption
Government studies and investigations
Internal Revenue Service (IRS)
Tax administration and collection, taxpayers
Taxation
Department of the Treasury
Employee performance
Evidence and witnesses
Government ethics and transparency, public corruption
Government studies and investigations
Internal Revenue Service (IRS)
Tax administration and collection, taxpayers
Taxation