TX SR428 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 20-0)
Status: Passed on March 24 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-16 - Again read
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 20-0)
Status: Passed on March 24 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-16 - Again read
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Proclaiming April 16, 2015, as Texas Federation of Republican Women Legislative Day.
Title
Proclaiming April 16, 2015, as Texas Federation of Republican Women Legislative Day.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-16 | Senate | Again read |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Reported enrolled |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Read & adopted |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
Resolutions
Resolutions--Official Designations
Resolutions--Official Designations--Special Dates
TEXAS FEDERATION OF REPUBLICAN WOMEN LEGISLATIVE DAY
Resolutions--Official Designations
Resolutions--Official Designations--Special Dates
TEXAS FEDERATION OF REPUBLICAN WOMEN LEGISLATIVE DAY
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=84R&Bill=SR428 |
Text | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/84R/billtext/html/SR00428F.htm |