TX SJR58 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-21 - Committee report printed and distributed
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-21 - Committee report printed and distributed
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Proposing a constitutional amendment to prohibit a person from being placed on a ballot as a candidate for public office if the person has an outstanding financial obligation payable to the Texas Ethics Commission.
Title
Proposing a constitutional amendment to prohibit a person from being placed on a ballot as a candidate for public office if the person has an outstanding financial obligation payable to the Texas Ethics Commission.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-21 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Referred to State Affairs |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Read first time |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Filed |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
Elections
Elections--Candidates
ETHICS COMMISSION, TEXAS
Resolutions
Resolutions--Constitutional Amendments
Elections--Candidates
ETHICS COMMISSION, TEXAS
Resolutions
Resolutions--Constitutional Amendments