TX SJR38 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 11 2017 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-16 - Filed with the Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on May 11 2017 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-16 - Filed with the Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Rescinding certain applications made by the Texas Legislature to the United States Congress to call a national convention under Article V of the United States Constitution for proposing any amendment to that Constitution.
Title
Rescinding certain applications made by the Texas Legislature to the United States Congress to call a national convention under Article V of the United States Constitution for proposing any amendment to that Constitution.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-11 - Senate - Senate concurs in House amendment(s) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-03 - House - Adopted RV#624 (Y: 125 N: 20 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-02-28 - Senate - Adopted as amended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-03 - House - Adopted RV#624 (Y: 125 N: 20 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-02-28 - Senate - Adopted as amended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-16 | Filed with the Secretary of State | |
2017-05-15 | House | Signed in the House |
2017-05-15 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Reported enrolled |
2017-05-11 | House | Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Senate concurs in House amendment(s) |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Read |
2017-05-11 | Senate | House amendment(s) laid before the Senate |
2017-05-03 | Senate | House passage as amended reported |
2017-05-03 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-03 | House | Record vote |
2017-05-03 | House | Adopted |
2017-05-03 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-05-03 | House | Placed on Constitutional Amendments Calendar |
2017-04-26 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2017-04-25 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2017-04-25 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-04-25 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-04-20 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2017-04-20 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2017-04-20 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2017-04-13 | House | Left pending in committee |
2017-04-13 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2017-04-13 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-13 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-04-10 | House | Posting rule suspended |
2017-04-10 | House | Referred to State & Federal Power & Responsibility, Select |
2017-04-10 | House | Read first time |
2017-03-01 | House | Received from the Senate |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Adopted as amended |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Amended |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Amended |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2017-02-27 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Referred to State Affairs |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Read first time |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Filed |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
Congress
Legislature
Resolutions
Resolutions--Constitutional Amendments
Resolutions--Memorializing Congress
Resolutions--United States Constitution
SECRETARY OF STATE
Legislature
Resolutions
Resolutions--Constitutional Amendments
Resolutions--Memorializing Congress
Resolutions--United States Constitution
SECRETARY OF STATE