TX SJR37 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 27 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-22 - Left pending in committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-22 - Left pending in committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Proposing a constitutional amendment providing for certain excess revenue to be dedicated toward contributions to state retirement systems, the health benefit plan for retired education employees and their dependents, the Texas tomorrow fund, the permanent school fund, and the permanent university fund.
Title
Proposing a constitutional amendment providing for certain excess revenue to be dedicated toward contributions to state retirement systems, the health benefit plan for retired education employees and their dependents, the Texas tomorrow fund, the permanent school fund, and the permanent university fund.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-22 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Referred to Finance |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Read first time |
2015-02-27 | Senate | Filed |
2015-02-27 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
Education
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--Student Financial Aid
Insurance
Insurance--Health & Accident
Insurance--Public Employees
PERMANENT SCHOOL FUND
PERMANENT UNIVERSITY FUND
Resolutions
Resolutions--Constitutional Amendments
Retirement Systems
Retirement Systems--State Employees
Retirement Systems--Teachers
State Finances
State Finances--Budget
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--Student Financial Aid
Insurance
Insurance--Health & Accident
Insurance--Public Employees
PERMANENT SCHOOL FUND
PERMANENT UNIVERSITY FUND
Resolutions
Resolutions--Constitutional Amendments
Retirement Systems
Retirement Systems--State Employees
Retirement Systems--Teachers
State Finances
State Finances--Budget
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=84R&Bill=SJR37 |
Text | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/84R/billtext/html/SJ00037I.htm |