TX SJR22 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-04 - Not again placed on intent calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-04 - Not again placed on intent calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Proposing a constitutional amendment to provide that the governor, and the lieutenant governor when acting as governor, retain executive authority unless unavailable as provided by law.
Title
Proposing a constitutional amendment to provide that the governor, and the lieutenant governor when acting as governor, retain executive authority unless unavailable as provided by law.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-04 | Senate | Not again placed on intent calendar |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2013-03-25 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2013-03-25 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2013-03-25 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Referred to State Affairs |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Read first time |
2013-01-29 | Senate | Filed |
2013-01-29 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
SB292 (Enabled by) 2013-04-04 - Not again placed on intent calendar