TX SCR27 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 6 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-03-06 - Signed by the Governor
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 6 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-03-06 - Signed by the Governor
Summary
Recognizing February 26, 2009, as TIPRO Day at the State Capitol.
Title
Recognizing February 26, 2009, as TIPRO Day at the State Capitol.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-03-06 | Signed by the Governor | |
2009-03-02 | Sent to the Governor | |
2009-03-02 | Signed in the House | |
2009-03-02 | Signed in the Senate | |
2009-02-25 | Reported enrolled | |
2009-02-25 | House passage reported | |
2009-02-25 | Adopted | |
2009-02-25 | Rules suspended | |
2009-02-25 | Received from the Senate | |
2009-02-24 | Read & adopted | |
2009-02-19 | Filed | |
2009-02-19 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
Resolutions
Resolutions--Official Designations
Resolutions--Official Designations--Special Dates
TIPRO DAY
Resolutions--Official Designations
Resolutions--Official Designations--Special Dates
TIPRO DAY