TX SCR18 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 19 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-07 - Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 19 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-07 - Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Designating Kyle as the official Pie Capital of Texas for a 10-year period beginning in 2019.
Title
Designating Kyle as the official Pie Capital of Texas for a 10-year period beginning in 2019.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-07 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2019-05-06 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-05-06 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-05-01 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2019-05-01 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2019-05-01 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-23 | House | Referred to Culture, Recreation & Tourism |
2019-04-18 | House | Received from the Senate |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Adopted |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Referred to Administration |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Filed |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HCR89 (Same As) 2019-05-01 - Companion considered in lieu of in committee
Subjects
KYLE, CITY OF
PIE CAPITAL OF TEXAS
Resolutions
Resolutions--Official Designations
Resolutions--Official Designations--Capitals
PIE CAPITAL OF TEXAS
Resolutions
Resolutions--Official Designations
Resolutions--Official Designations--Capitals