TX SB945 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on March 2 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-20 - Left pending in committee
Pending: Senate Criminal Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 2 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-20 - Left pending in committee
Pending: Senate Criminal Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the prosecution of the criminal offense of sexual assault.
Title
Relating to the prosecution of the criminal offense of sexual assault.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-20 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Referred to Criminal Justice |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Read first time |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Filed |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB4135 (Same As) 2021-03-29 - Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence
Subjects
Crimes
Crimes--Against Persons
Crimes--Against Persons--Sexual
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--General
Health Care Providers
SEXUAL ASSAULT
Crimes--Against Persons
Crimes--Against Persons--Sexual
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--General
Health Care Providers
SEXUAL ASSAULT