TX SB920 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 9 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-09 - Effective on 9/1/17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 9 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-09 - Effective on 9/1/17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to access to a residence or former residence to retrieve personal property, including access based on danger of family violence.
Title
Relating to access to a residence or former residence to retrieve personal property, including access based on danger of family violence.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-25 - Senate - Senate concurs in House amendment(s) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-21 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1478 (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-04-03 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-03 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-21 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1478 (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-04-03 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-03 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-09 | Effective on 9/1/17 | |
2017-06-09 | Signed by the Governor | |
2017-05-28 | Sent to the Governor | |
2017-05-28 | House | Signed in the House |
2017-05-27 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Reported enrolled |
2017-05-25 | House | Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Senate concurs in House amendment(s) |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Read |
2017-05-25 | Senate | House amendment(s) laid before the Senate |
2017-05-21 | Senate | House passage as amended reported |
2017-05-21 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-21 | House | Record vote |
2017-05-21 | House | Passed |
2017-05-21 | House | Read 3rd time |
2017-05-20 | House | Passed to 3rd reading |
2017-05-20 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-05-20 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2017-05-18 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2017-05-16 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2017-05-16 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-05-16 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-05-15 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2017-05-15 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2017-05-15 | House | Vote reconsidered in committee |
2017-05-15 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-05-08 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2017-05-08 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2017-04-18 | House | Referred to Business & Industry |
2017-04-18 | House | Read first time |
2017-04-04 | House | Received from the Senate |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Passed |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Referred to Criminal Justice |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Rereferred to committee |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Referred to State Affairs |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Read first time |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Filed |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
Family
Family--Family Violence
JUSTICE OF THE PEACE
Law Enforcement
Property Interests
Property Interests--Personal Property
Family--Family Violence
JUSTICE OF THE PEACE
Law Enforcement
Property Interests
Property Interests--Personal Property