TX SB88 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-2)
Status: Engrossed on March 29 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-05 - Referred to Transportation
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 29 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-05 - Referred to Transportation
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the use of photographic traffic signal enforcement systems.
Title
Relating to the use of photographic traffic signal enforcement systems.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-29 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 26 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-29 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 26 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-29 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-29 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 26 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-29 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-05 | House | Referred to Transportation |
2017-05-05 | House | Read first time |
2017-03-30 | House | Received from the Senate |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Passed |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Amended |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Amended |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Amended |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Referred to Transportation |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Read first time |
2016-11-14 | Senate | Filed |
2016-11-14 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
Fees & Other Nontax Revenue
Fees & Other Nontax Revenue--Local
PHOTOGRAPHIC TRAFFIC SIGNALS
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--General
Vehicles & Traffic--Rules of Road
Fees & Other Nontax Revenue--Local
PHOTOGRAPHIC TRAFFIC SIGNALS
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--General
Vehicles & Traffic--Rules of Road