TX SB870 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-18 - Not again placed on intent calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-18 - Not again placed on intent calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the scheduling by an appraisal review board of a hearing on a protest.
Title
Relating to the scheduling by an appraisal review board of a hearing on a protest.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-18 | Senate | Not again placed on intent calendar |
2017-05-15 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Not again placed on intent calendar |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-02-27 | Senate | Referred to Finance |
2017-02-27 | Senate | Read first time |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Filed |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
Taxation
Taxation--Property-Appeal of Tax Decisions
Taxation--Property-Appraisals & Appraisal Districts
Taxation--Property-Appeal of Tax Decisions
Taxation--Property-Appraisals & Appraisal Districts