TX SB848 | 2011-2012 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 22 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-11 - Not again placed on intent calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 22 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-11 - Not again placed on intent calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to ambulatory surgical centers and to the provision of services at those centers by certain designated physician groups.
Title
Relating to ambulatory surgical centers and to the provision of services at those centers by certain designated physician groups.
Sponsors
Sen. Dan Patrick [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-11 | Not again placed on intent calendar | |
2011-05-10 | Placed on intent calendar | |
2011-04-29 | Not again placed on intent calendar | |
2011-04-27 | Placed on intent calendar | |
2011-04-21 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2011-04-21 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2011-04-19 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-03-22 | Left pending in committee | |
2011-03-22 | Testimony taken in committee | |
2011-03-22 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-03-22 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-03-01 | Referred to Health & Human Services | |
2011-03-01 | Read first time | |
2011-02-22 | Filed | |
2011-02-22 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
AMBULATORY HEALTH CARE
Health Care Providers
Insurance
Insurance--Health & Accident
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Health Occupations
PHYSICIANS
STATE HEALTH SERVICES, DEPARTMENT OF
Health Care Providers
Insurance
Insurance--Health & Accident
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Health Occupations
PHYSICIANS
STATE HEALTH SERVICES, DEPARTMENT OF