TX SB810 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 29 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-20 - Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 29 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-20 - Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the course information required to be posted on a public institution of higher education's Internet website.
Title
Relating to the course information required to be posted on a public institution of higher education's Internet website.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-29 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-20 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2021-05-19 | House | Committee report distributed |
2021-05-19 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2021-05-17 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2021-05-17 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2021-05-17 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2021-05-13 | House | Left pending in committee |
2021-05-13 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2021-05-13 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-05-13 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-05-04 | House | Referred to Higher Education |
2021-05-04 | House | Read first time |
2021-04-29 | House | Received from the Senate |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Passed |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Referred to Higher Education |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Read first time |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Filed |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
COMPTROLLER OF PUBLIC ACCOUNTS
Education
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--Institutions & Programs
Electronic Information Systems
HIGHER EDUCATION COORDINATING BOARD, TEXAS
INTERNET
Education
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--Institutions & Programs
Electronic Information Systems
HIGHER EDUCATION COORDINATING BOARD, TEXAS
INTERNET