TX SB802 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 29 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-29 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 29 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-29 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to a study and report regarding best practices in the transfer of course credit between public institutions of higher education.
Title
Relating to a study and report regarding best practices in the transfer of course credit between public institutions of higher education.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-23 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1607 (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-29 | Effective immediately | |
2017-05-29 | Signed by the Governor | |
2017-05-24 | Sent to the Governor | |
2017-05-24 | House | Signed in the House |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Reported enrolled |
2017-05-23 | Senate | House passage reported |
2017-05-23 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-23 | House | Record vote |
2017-05-23 | House | Passed |
2017-05-23 | House | Read 3rd time |
2017-05-22 | House | Passed to 3rd reading |
2017-05-22 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-05-22 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2017-05-20 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2017-05-19 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2017-05-19 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-05-19 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-05-17 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2017-05-17 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2017-05-17 | House | Left pending in committee |
2017-05-17 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2017-05-17 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-05-17 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-05-16 | House | Posting rule suspended |
2017-05-03 | House | Referred to Higher Education |
2017-05-03 | House | Read first time |
2017-03-23 | House | Received from the Senate |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Passed |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Referred to Higher Education |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Read first time |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Filed |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
Education
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--Institutions & Programs
Education--Higher--State Coordination
Education--Junior College Districts
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Curriculum
HIGHER EDUCATION COORDINATING BOARD, TEXAS
TRANSFER STUDENTS
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--Institutions & Programs
Education--Higher--State Coordination
Education--Junior College Districts
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Curriculum
HIGHER EDUCATION COORDINATING BOARD, TEXAS
TRANSFER STUDENTS