TX SB802 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 29 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-29 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to a study and report regarding best practices in the transfer of course credit between public institutions of higher education.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to a study and report regarding best practices in the transfer of course credit between public institutions of higher education.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-23 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1607 (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-29 Effective immediately
2017-05-29 Signed by the Governor
2017-05-24 Sent to the Governor
2017-05-24HouseSigned in the House
2017-05-24SenateSigned in the Senate
2017-05-23SenateReported enrolled
2017-05-23SenateHouse passage reported
2017-05-23HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-23HouseRecord vote
2017-05-23HousePassed
2017-05-23HouseRead 3rd time
2017-05-22HousePassed to 3rd reading
2017-05-22HouseRead 2nd time
2017-05-22HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2017-05-20HouseConsidered in Calendars
2017-05-19HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2017-05-19HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-05-19HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-05-17HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2017-05-17HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2017-05-17HouseLeft pending in committee
2017-05-17HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2017-05-17HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-05-17HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-05-16HousePosting rule suspended
2017-05-03HouseReferred to Higher Education
2017-05-03HouseRead first time
2017-03-23HouseReceived from the Senate
2017-03-22SenateReported engrossed
2017-03-22SenateRecord vote
2017-03-22SenatePassed
2017-03-22SenateRead 3rd time
2017-03-22SenateRecord vote
2017-03-22SenateThree day rule suspended
2017-03-22SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-03-22SenateRead 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2017-03-22SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2017-03-22SenateCo-author authorized
2017-03-21SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2017-03-16SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2017-03-16SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2017-03-16SenateReported favorably as substituted
2017-03-15SenateTestimony taken in committee
2017-03-15SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-03-15SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-02-22SenateReferred to Higher Education
2017-02-22SenateRead first time
2017-02-09SenateFiled
2017-02-09SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback