TX SB788 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-12 - Not again placed on intent calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-12 - Not again placed on intent calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the administration of and benefits payable under the Texas Public School Retired Employees Group Benefits Act.
Title
Relating to the administration of and benefits payable under the Texas Public School Retired Employees Group Benefits Act.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-12 | Senate | Not again placed on intent calendar |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Referred to State Affairs |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Read first time |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Filed |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |