TX SB756 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 7 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-19 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 7 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-19 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the administration of the Jobs and Education for Texans (JET) Grant Program.
Title
Relating to the administration of the Jobs and Education for Texans (JET) Grant Program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-07 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 27 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 27 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 27 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-19 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-05-19 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-05-18 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-05-16 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2019-05-16 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2019-05-15 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-05-15 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2019-05-15 | House | Scheduled for formal meeting on . . . |
2019-05-13 | House | Referred to International Relations & Economic Development |
2019-05-13 | House | Read first time |
2019-05-07 | House | Received from the Senate |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Passed |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Removed from local & uncontested calendar |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Not again placed on intent calendar |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Referred to Higher Education |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Filed |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
Charitable & Nonprofit Organizations
Education
Education--General
Labor
Labor--Workforce Development
WORKFORCE COMMISSION, TEXAS
Education
Education--General
Labor
Labor--Workforce Development
WORKFORCE COMMISSION, TEXAS