TX SB738 | 2011-2012 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-17 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-17 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to a parental role in determining sanctions applied to a public school campus under certain circumstances.
Title
Relating to a parental role in determining sanctions applied to a public school campus under certain circumstances.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-17 | Effective immediately | |
2011-06-17 | Signed by the Governor | |
2011-05-27 | Sent to the Governor | |
2011-05-26 | Signed in the House | |
2011-05-26 | Signed in the Senate | |
2011-05-26 | Reported enrolled | |
2011-05-25 | House passage reported | |
2011-05-25 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-25 | Record vote | |
2011-05-25 | Passed | |
2011-05-25 | Laid out as postponed business | |
2011-05-25 | Postponed | |
2011-05-25 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-05-24 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-24 | Passed to 3rd reading | |
2011-05-24 | Amendment withdrawn | |
2011-05-24 | Vote reconsidered | |
2011-05-24 | Laid out as postponed business | |
2011-05-23 | Postponed | |
2011-05-23 | Point of order withdrawn | |
2011-05-23 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-23 | Record vote | |
2011-05-23 | Amended | |
2011-05-23 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-23 | Record vote | |
2011-05-23 | Amendment to amendment tabled | |
2011-05-23 | Point of order overruled (amendment) | |
2011-05-23 | Amendment(s) offered | |
2011-05-23 | Amendment withdrawn | |
2011-05-23 | Vote reconsidered | |
2011-05-23 | Laid out as postponed business | |
2011-05-23 | Postponed | |
2011-05-23 | Record vote | |
2011-05-23 | Vote reconsidered | |
2011-05-23 | 1 hr. notice-for reconsideration | |
2011-05-21 | Passed to 3rd reading as amended | |
2011-05-21 | Amended | |
2011-05-21 | Read 2nd time | |
2011-05-21 | Placed on General State Calendar | |
2011-05-19 | Considered in Calendars | |
2011-05-18 | Committee report sent to Calendars | |
2011-05-18 | Committee report distributed | |
2011-05-18 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2011-05-16 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | |
2011-05-16 | Considered in formal meeting | |
2011-05-12 | Left pending in committee | |
2011-05-12 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2011-05-12 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-05-12 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-05-11 | Posting rule suspended | |
2011-05-10 | No action taken in committee | |
2011-05-10 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-05-02 | Referred to Public Education | |
2011-05-02 | Read first time | |
2011-04-28 | Received from the Senate | |
2011-04-28 | Reported engrossed | |
2011-04-28 | Record vote | |
2011-04-28 | Passed | |
2011-04-28 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-04-28 | Record vote | |
2011-04-28 | Three day rule suspended | |
2011-04-28 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-04-28 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | |
2011-04-28 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-04-28 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | |
2011-04-27 | Placed on intent calendar | |
2011-04-26 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2011-04-26 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | |
2011-04-26 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2011-04-19 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-04-19 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-04-14 | No action taken in committee | |
2011-04-14 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-04-12 | No action taken in committee | |
2011-04-12 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-03-22 | Left pending in committee | |
2011-03-22 | Testimony taken in committee | |
2011-03-22 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-03-22 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-02-23 | Referred to Education | |
2011-02-23 | Read first time | |
2011-02-16 | Filed | |
2011-02-16 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
ACADEMIC PERFORMANCE
Education
EDUCATION, COMMISSIONER OF
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Accountability
Education--Primary & Secondary--Charter Schools
Education--Primary & Secondary--Other School Personnel
Education--School Districts
Elections
Elections--School District
Education
EDUCATION, COMMISSIONER OF
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Accountability
Education--Primary & Secondary--Charter Schools
Education--Primary & Secondary--Other School Personnel
Education--School Districts
Elections
Elections--School District