TX SB719 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-14 - Effective on 9/1/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to increasing the punishment for certain conduct constituting the offense of murder and providing for the prosecution of that conduct as capital murder.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to increasing the punishment for certain conduct constituting the offense of murder and providing for the prosecution of that conduct as capital murder.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-23 - Senate - Senate concurs in House amendment(s) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Senate - Senate concurs in House amendment(s) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1566 (Y: 132 N: 8 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - House - Amendment withdrawn RV#1526 (Y: 119 N: 19 NV: 2 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-14 Effective on 9/1/19
2019-06-14 Signed by the Governor
2019-05-25 Sent to the Governor
2019-05-25SenateSigned in the Senate
2019-05-25HouseSigned in the House
2019-05-24SenateReported enrolled
2019-05-23HouseSenate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
2019-05-23SenateRecord vote
2019-05-23SenateSenate concurs in House amendment(s)
2019-05-23SenateRead
2019-05-23SenateHouse amendment(s) laid before the Senate
2019-05-21SenateHouse passage as amended reported
2019-05-21HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2019-05-21HouseRecord vote RV#1566
2019-05-21HousePassed
2019-05-21HouseRead 3rd time
2019-05-20HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2019-05-20HouseRecord vote RV#1526
2019-05-20HousePassed to 3rd reading
2019-05-20HouseAmendment withdrawn 1-Cain
2019-05-20HousePoint of order withdrawn (amendment) Rule 11, Section 2
2019-05-20HouseStatement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal
2019-05-20HouseAmendment(s) offered 1-Cain
2019-05-20HouseRead 2nd time
2019-05-20HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2019-05-17HouseConsidered in Calendars
2019-05-16HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2019-05-15HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-05-14HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-05-09HouseReported favorably as substituted
2019-05-09HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2019-05-09HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2019-04-23HouseReferred to Criminal Jurisprudence
2019-04-23HouseRead first time
2019-04-17HouseReceived from the Senate
2019-04-16SenateReported engrossed
2019-04-16SenateReason for vote recorded in Journal
2019-04-16SenateRecord vote
2019-04-16SenatePassed
2019-04-16SenateRead 3rd time
2019-04-16SenateRecord vote
2019-04-16SenateThree day rule suspended
2019-04-16SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-04-16SenateRead 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2019-04-16SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2019-04-16SenateCo-author authorized
2019-04-09SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2019-04-08SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2019-04-08SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2019-04-04SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-04SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-04-04SenatePosting rule suspended
2019-04-03SenateLeft pending in committee
2019-04-03SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-03SenatePosting rule suspended
2019-04-03SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-04-02SenateMeeting cancelled
2019-04-02SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-03-01SenateReferred to Criminal Justice
2019-03-01SenateRead first time
2019-02-08SenateFiled
2019-02-08SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Same As/Similar To

HB261 (Same As) 2019-04-26 - Committee report sent to Calendars

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=SB719
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/SB00719I.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/SB00719S.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/SB00719E.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/SB00719H.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/SB00719F.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/86r/pdf/86RSJ04-16-F.PDF#page=29
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=SB719&RcdVtNo=1526&Ch=H&Dt=05/20/2019
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=SB719&RcdVtNo=1566&Ch=H&Dt=05/21/2019
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/86r/pdf/86RSJ05-23-F.PDF#page=425

Bill Comments

feedback