TX HB261 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on November 12 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-26 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to increasing the punishment for certain conduct constituting the offense of murder and providing for the prosecution of that conduct as capital murder.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to increasing the punishment for certain conduct constituting the offense of murder and providing for the prosecution of that conduct as capital murder.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-26HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2019-04-25HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-04-25HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-04-16HouseReported favorably as substituted
2019-04-16HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2019-04-16HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2019-04-01HouseLeft pending in committee
2019-04-01HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2019-04-01HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-01HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-02-19HouseReferred to Criminal Jurisprudence
2019-02-19HouseRead first time
2018-11-12HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

SB719 (Same As) 2019-06-14 - Effective on 9/1/19

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback