TX SB709 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 16-5)
Status: Enrolled on May 24 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-05-24 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the allocation and use of the annual constitutional appropriation to certain agencies and institutions of higher education.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the allocation and use of the annual constitutional appropriation to certain agencies and institutions of higher education.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-15 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1398 (Y: 135 N: 10 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2019-04-10 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-24SenateReported enrolled
2019-05-23HouseSenate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
2019-05-23SenateRecord vote
2019-05-23SenateSenate concurs in House amendment(s)
2019-05-23SenateRead
2019-05-23SenateHouse amendment(s) laid before the Senate
2019-05-15SenateHouse passage as amended reported
2019-05-15HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2019-05-15HouseRecord vote RV#1398
2019-05-15HousePassed
2019-05-15HouseRead 3rd time
2019-05-14HousePassed to 3rd reading
2019-05-14HouseRead 2nd time
2019-05-14HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2019-05-10HouseConsidered in Calendars
2019-04-29HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2019-04-29HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-04-29HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-04-26HouseReported favorably as substituted
2019-04-26HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2019-04-26HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2019-04-12HouseReferred to Appropriations
2019-04-12HouseRead first time
2019-04-11HouseReceived from the Senate
2019-04-10SenateReported engrossed
2019-04-10SenateRecord vote
2019-04-10SenatePassed
2019-04-10SenateRead 3rd time
2019-04-10SenateRecord vote
2019-04-10SenateThree day rule suspended
2019-04-10SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-04-10SenateRead 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2019-04-10SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-04-10SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2019-04-08SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2019-04-04SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2019-04-04SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2019-04-04SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2019-04-03SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-03-27SenateLeft pending in committee
2019-03-27SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-03-27SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-03-01SenateReferred to Higher Education
2019-03-01SenateRead first time
2019-02-08SenateFiled
2019-02-08SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Same As/Similar To

HB1562 (Same As) 2019-04-16 - Committee report sent to Calendars

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback