TX HB1562 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 15-4)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-16 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-16 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the allocation and use of the annual constitutional appropriation to certain agencies and institutions of higher education.
Title
Relating to the allocation and use of the annual constitutional appropriation to certain agencies and institutions of higher education.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-16 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-04-15 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-15 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-04-10 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-04-10 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-04-10 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2019-04-10 | House | Recalled from subcommittee |
2019-04-03 | House | Left pending in subcommittee |
2019-04-03 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in subcommittee |
2019-04-03 | House | Committee substitute considered in s/c |
2019-04-03 | House | Considered by s/c in public hearing |
2019-04-03 | House | Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . . |
2019-03-11 | House | Referred directly to subcommittee by chair |
2019-03-04 | House | Referred to Appropriations |
2019-03-04 | House | Read first time |
2019-02-11 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB709 (Same As) 2019-06-14 - Effective on . . . . . . . . . . . . . . . August 31, 2019
Subjects
Education
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--Finance
Education--Higher--Institutions & Programs
MIDWESTERN STATE UNIVERSITY
State Finances
State Finances--Appropriations
STEPHEN F. AUSTIN STATE UNIVERSITY
TEXAS A&M UNIVERSITY SYSTEM
TEXAS SOUTHERN UNIVERSITY
TEXAS STATE TECHNICAL COLLEGE
TEXAS STATE TECHNICAL COLLEGE SYSTEM
TEXAS STATE TECHNICAL COLLEGE--FORT BEND
TEXAS STATE TECHNICAL COLLEGE--NORTH TEXAS
TEXAS STATE UNIVERSITY SYSTEM
TEXAS TECH UNIVERSITY SYSTEM
TEXAS WOMAN'S UNIVERSITY
UNIVERSITY OF HOUSTON SYSTEM
UNIVERSITY OF NORTH TEXAS SYSTEM
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--Finance
Education--Higher--Institutions & Programs
MIDWESTERN STATE UNIVERSITY
State Finances
State Finances--Appropriations
STEPHEN F. AUSTIN STATE UNIVERSITY
TEXAS A&M UNIVERSITY SYSTEM
TEXAS SOUTHERN UNIVERSITY
TEXAS STATE TECHNICAL COLLEGE
TEXAS STATE TECHNICAL COLLEGE SYSTEM
TEXAS STATE TECHNICAL COLLEGE--FORT BEND
TEXAS STATE TECHNICAL COLLEGE--NORTH TEXAS
TEXAS STATE UNIVERSITY SYSTEM
TEXAS TECH UNIVERSITY SYSTEM
TEXAS WOMAN'S UNIVERSITY
UNIVERSITY OF HOUSTON SYSTEM
UNIVERSITY OF NORTH TEXAS SYSTEM