TX SB632 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-25 - Not again placed on intent calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-25 - Not again placed on intent calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the repeal of certain state procurement advisory and approval procedures.
Title
Relating to the repeal of certain state procurement advisory and approval procedures.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-25 | Senate | Not again placed on intent calendar |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Referred to Business & Commerce |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Read first time |
2017-01-26 | Senate | Filed |
2017-01-26 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |